LA HB10 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides with respect to off-duty law enforcement witness fees for the 24th JDC

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides with respect to off-duty law enforcement witness fees for the 24th JDC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-02-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2019.
2019-02-18HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-02-18HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback