LA HB10 | 2018 | 3rd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-24 - Effective date: 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the rate and base for state sales and use taxes (Item #1) (EN +$463,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the rate and base for state sales and use taxes (Item #1) (EN +$463,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#24) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Vote on HB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#11) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#7) (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 10 AMENDMENT # 110 BY CARTER S. MOTION TO ADOPT (#5) (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-24HouseEffective date: 7/1/2018.
2018-06-24HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1.
2018-06-24HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-06-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-06-24HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-06-24HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-06-24SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-06-23SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-06-23SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-06-22SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2018-06-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 24. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-22HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/22/18.
2018-06-22HouseNotice given.
2018-06-22HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2018-06-21HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 40. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/21/18.
2018-06-20HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-06-20HouseRules suspended.
2018-06-20HouseReported with amendments (12-5).
2018-06-19HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=183ES&b=HB10&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104553
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104660
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105010
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105154
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105364
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104645
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104623
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104604
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104595
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104696
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104732
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104894
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104871
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104830
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104892
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104887
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104767
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104594
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104554
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104699
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104677
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105035
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105077
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105054
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105358
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1108564
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104899
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105036
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105202

Bill Comments

feedback