LA HB10 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-12-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the payment of refunded contributions to members of the Firefighters' Retirement System and for survivor benefits in certain circumstances (EG INCREASE APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the payment of refunded contributions to members of the Firefighters' Retirement System and for survivor benefits in certain circumstances (EG INCREASE APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#87) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2018-03-26SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-03-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/22/18.
2018-03-19HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-15HouseReported with amendments (7-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2018-01-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2018.
2018-01-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2018-01-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback