LA HB1 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the ordinary operating expenses of state government for Fiscal Year 2020-2021 (Item #1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the ordinary operating expenses of state government for Fiscal Year 2020-2021 (Item #1)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 ADOPT (#184) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on HB 1 MOTION TO ADOPT (#186) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on HB 1 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#142) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#140) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 01-100 EXECUTIVE OFFICE (#139) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 525 BY PETERSON HB 1 BY ZERINGUE (#138) (Y: 6 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#13) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 230 BY EDMONDS MOTION TO ADOPT (#12) (Y: 19 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
2020-06-30HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-30HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-30SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-30HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-30HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-30HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-06-29HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-06-29SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: White, Cloud, and Tarver.
2020-06-29SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-06-29SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-06-29HouseHouse conferees appointed: Zeringue, Schexnayder, and Dustin Miller.
2020-06-29HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-06-28HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/29/20.
2020-06-28HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-26SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended.
2020-06-25SenateRead by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for 06/26.
2020-06-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-24SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-17SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2020-06-17SenateRules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
2020-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-06-10HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-05HouseMade Special Order of the day No. 1 for 06/10/20.
2020-06-05HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-05HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-05HouseReported with amendments (21-0).
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB1&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179093
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180359
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181018
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181300
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185203
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179986
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179984
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179950
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179619
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179412
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180016
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179997
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179982
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180338
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181033
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181221
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181224
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181250
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181252
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180305
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181293
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184003
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184463
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184460
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184448
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184447
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184432
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184409
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184408
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184289
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184458
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184749
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179095
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180362
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181407
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181336
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184462
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184482
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185140
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185146

Bill Comments

feedback