KY SR88 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution declaring February 26 through March 4, 2018, as Eating Disorder Awareness Week in Kentucky, in conjunction with the observance of National Eating Disorder Awareness Week.
Title
A resolution declaring February 26 through March 4, 2018, as Eating Disorder Awareness Week in Kentucky, in conjunction with the observance of National Eating Disorder Awareness Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2018-01-16 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2018-01-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SR88.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SR88/bill.pdf |