KY SR6 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Commend Taiwan for its relations with the United States.
Title
Commend Taiwan for its relations with the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Buford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2017-02-21 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2017-02-21 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2017-01-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SR6.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SR6/bill.pdf |