KY SR46 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-07 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-07 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Honoring Kentucky Youth Advocates and adjourning in honor of Children's Advocacy Day, February 7, 2013.
Title
Honoring Kentucky Youth Advocates and adjourning in honor of Children's Advocacy Day, February 7, 2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2013-02-06 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2013-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SR46.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SR46/bill.doc |