KY SR285 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - passed 38-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - passed 38-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm the reappointment of Jan M. Buddeke to the Kentucky Lottery Corporation Board of Directors for a term expiring November 28, 2021.
Title
Confirm the reappointment of Jan M. Buddeke to the Kentucky Lottery Corporation Board of Directors for a term expiring November 28, 2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Seum [R] | Sen. Ernie Harris [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 596 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | passed 38-0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SR285.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SR285/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SR285/vote_history.pdf |