KY SR238 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Recognize March 7, 2018, as Refugee and Immigrant Day at the Capitol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognize March 7, 2018, as Refugee and Immigrant Day at the Capitol.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07Senateadopted by voice vote
2018-03-05Senateto Senate Floor
2018-02-27Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback