KY SR215 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - adopted 37-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Confirm the appointment of Faith Lorraine Kemper to the Kentucky Council on Postsecondary Education for a term expiring December 31, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION confirming the appointment of Faith Lorraine Kemper to the Kentucky Council on Postsecondary Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Adopt RSN# 2837 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30Senateadopted 37-0
2023-03-30Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2023
2023-03-16Senateto Education (S)
2023-03-13Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2023-03-13Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback