KY SR20 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-9)
Status: Passed on January 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Declare January 15, 2020, to be Hunger Free Kentucky Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION declaring January 15, 2020, to be Hunger Free Kentucky Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15Senateadopted by voice vote
2020-01-08Senateto Senate Floor
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback