KY SR172 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the board of education or board of trustees of a school to allow teachers and other school personnel to carry firearms for their own protection.
Title
Urge the board of education or board of trustees of a school to allow teachers and other school personnel to carry firearms for their own protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SR172.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SR172/bill.pdf |