KY SR10 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declare October 5, 2020, to be Ostomy Awareness Day.
Title
A RESOLUTION declaring October 5, 2020, to be Ostomy Awareness Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2020-01-08 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2020-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sr10.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sr10/orig_bill.pdf |