KY SJR6 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 187)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 187)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Transportation Cabinet to designated the Warren Lanham Memorial Highway in Daviess County.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION designating honorary names for various roads and bridges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Adopt w/ hcs1 RSN# 2337 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 519 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Adoption w/ scs1 sfa1 scta1 RSN# 2155 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 519 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Adoption w/ scs1 sfa1 scta1 RSN# 2155 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 187) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | passed 33-0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 85-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-22 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2022-03-18 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-18 | House | received in House |
2022-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading, adopted 32-0 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1), and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-16 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |