KY SJR54 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 46)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 46)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Department for Medicaid Services to develop a proposal to link Medicaid reimbursements to Area Deprivation Index scores; submit findings and proposals to the Legislative Research Commission by November 1, 2023; EMERGENCY.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION directing the Department for Medicaid Services to study and examine Medicaid reimbursements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Adopt FINAL ION W/ hfa1 hfta2 RSN# 2660 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Adopt RCS# 247 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 246 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Adopt RSN# 2497 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Adopt RCS# 247 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 246 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Adopt RSN# 2497 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 46) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-16 | Senate | passed 34-0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment Floor Amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Floor Amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Floor Amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2023-03-15 | House | floor amendment (2-title) filed |
2023-03-14 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2023-03-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2023-02-24 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-24 | House | received in House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-02-09 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Legislative Research Commission
Medicaid
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Medical Assistance
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Studies Directed
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Legislative Research Commission
Medicaid
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Medical Assistance
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Studies Directed