KY SJR20 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 51)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 51)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Direct the Auditor of Public Accounts to study the number of sexual assault examination kits in the possession of Kentucky law enforcement and prosecutorial agencies that have not been sent to the Department of Kentucky State Police forensic laboratory for testing; require a report to the Legislative Research Commission by November 1, 2015.
Title
Direct the Auditor of Public Accounts to study the number of sexual assault examination kits in the possession of Kentucky law enforcement and prosecutorial agencies that have not been sent to the Department of Kentucky State Police forensic laboratory for testing; require a report to the Legislative Research Commission by November 1, 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 51) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-11 | Senate | adopted 36-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 98-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-09 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | 2nd reading |
2015-03-09 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | posting waived |
2015-03-04 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-04 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | received in House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, adopted 35-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |