KY SJR158 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 91)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 91)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Tourism, Arts and Heritage Cabinet to identify historically significant Revolutionary War and Civil War battlefields, develop a strategy to protect and preserve historic battlefields, and submit a report on its findings to the Legislative Research Commission before November 1, 2018.
Title
Direct the Tourism, Arts and Heritage Cabinet to identify historically significant Revolutionary War and Civil War battlefields, develop a strategy to protect and preserve historic battlefields, and submit a report on its findings to the Legislative Research Commission before November 1, 2018.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 91) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2018-03-19 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-12 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-09 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | received in House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-1 with Committee Substitute (1) & committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 6, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |