KY SCR81 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establish a 17-member legislative task force to study small community public drinking water systems to create mechanisms for oversight and intervention so as to prevent the drinking system's decline and failure; require policy options to be submitted to the Legislative Research Commission for referral by December 15, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION establishing the Public Water and Wastewater System Infrastructure Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, scta 1 RSN# 837 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01Houseposted in committee
2019-02-26Houseto Local Government (H)
2019-02-25Housereceived in House
2019-02-22Senate3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-22Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019
2019-02-21Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-11Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2019-02-07Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback