KY SCR81 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a 17-member legislative task force to study small community public drinking water systems to create mechanisms for oversight and intervention so as to prevent the drinking system's decline and failure; require policy options to be submitted to the Legislative Research Commission for referral by December 15, 2019.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION establishing the Public Water and Wastewater System Infrastructure Task Force.
Sponsors
Sen. Robin Webb [D] | Sen. Wil Schroder [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, scta 1 RSN# 837 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | received in House |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Cities
Counties
Environment and Conservation
Legislative Research Commission
Local Government
Public Utilities
Public Works
Special Districts
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Water Supply
Counties
Environment and Conservation
Legislative Research Commission
Local Government
Public Utilities
Public Works
Special Districts
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Water Supply