KY SCR73 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Encourage civility at local school board meetings.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION encouraging an atmosphere of civility and respect on the part of all participants engaged in carrying out the critical functions of Kentucky's system of elementary and secondary education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | received in House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2022-01-27 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | introduced in Senate |