KY SCR36 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - to Senate Floor
Pending: Senate Floor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide that when the Senate and the House of Representatives adjourn on January 11, 2019, they adjourn until February 5, 2019, when the second part of the 2019 Regular Session shall convene.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION adjourning the 2019 Regular Session of the General Assembly until February 5, 2019.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-11Senateto Senate Floor
2019-01-09Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback