KY SCR176 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 119)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Urge the Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services, Department for Medicaid Services to continue to improve the provision of colorectal cancer screening services to Kentucky Medicaid recipients, which should include achieving an 80 percent colorectal cancer screening rate for certain Kentucky Medicaid recipients and holding Medicaid managed-care organizations accountable for achieving this goal; urge the DMS to ensure that all colorectal cancer screening services criteria for Medicaid managed care plans align, at a minimum, with the United States Preventative Services Task Force guidelines for reducing mortality from colorectal cancer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urge the Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services, Department for Medicaid Services to continue to improve the provision of colorectal cancer screening services to Kentucky Medicaid recipients, which should include achieving an 80 percent colorectal cancer screening rate for certain Kentucky Medicaid recipients and holding Medicaid managed-care organizations accountable for achieving this goal; urge the DMS to ensure that all colorectal cancer screening services criteria for Medicaid managed care plans align, at a minimum, with the United States Preventative Services Task Force guidelines for reducing mortality from colorectal cancer.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 119)
2018-03-29Senatedelivered to Governor
2018-03-29Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-29Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-29Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-29House3rd reading, passed 97-0
2018-03-27Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018
2018-03-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-22Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-03-22Houseposting waived
2018-03-21Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2018-03-19Housereceived in House
2018-03-16Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-15Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018
2018-03-15Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-14Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-13Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2018-02-12Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback