KY SCR171 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Request the Legislative Research Commission to examine funding sources and identify groups to conduct a feasibility study of advanced nuclear power in the Commonwealth.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION requesting the Legislative Research Commission to examine funding sources and research institutions capable of conducting a feasibility study of advanced nuclear energy technology for electric power generation in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Adopt RSN# 2168 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | received in House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | adopted 30-0 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-03-07 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |