KY SCR171 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Establish the Childhood Cancer Caucus within the Kentucky General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish the Childhood Cancer Caucus within the Kentucky General Assembly.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 17)
2018-03-08Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-08Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-08Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-08Housedelivered to Governor
2018-03-07House3rd reading, passed 95-0
2018-03-06Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 7, 2018
2018-03-02House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-01Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-02-27Houseposted in committee
2018-02-20Houseto State Government (H)
2018-02-15Housereceived in House
2018-02-15Senateadopted by voice vote
2018-02-13Senateto Senate Floor
2018-02-12Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback