KY SCR134 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-25 - to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Urge Congress to call an Article V convention for the purpose of proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States requiring a balanced federal budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urge Congress to call an Article V convention for the purpose of proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States requiring a balanced federal budget.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-25 to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2011-02-22 received in House
2011-02-22 3rd reading, adopted 22-16
2011-02-22 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 22, 2011
2011-02-22 reported favorably, to Rules
2011-02-17 to State & Local Government (S)
2011-02-17 returned to Committee on Committees (S)
2011-02-17 2nd reading
2011-02-17 taken from Committee on Committees (S)
2011-02-15 returned to Committee on Committees (S)
2011-02-15 1st reading
2011-02-15 taken from Committee on Committees (S)
2011-02-15 introduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback