KY SB95 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to establish that any health benefit plan issued or renewed in the Commonwealth that provides coverage for hospital, medical, or surgical expenses, shall include coverage for standard fertility preservation services when a necessary medical treatment may directly or indirectly cause iatrogenic infertility to an insured.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to coverage for medically necessary fertility preservation services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 499 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-22Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-22Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2018-03-19Houseposted in committee
2018-03-19Housereassigned to Health and Family Services (H)
2018-03-13Houseposted in committee
2018-03-13Housereassigned to Banking & Insurance (H)
2018-03-09Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-03-07Housereceived in House
2018-03-06Senate3rd reading, passed 34-3
2018-03-05Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 6, 2018
2018-02-28Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-27Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-01-22Senateto Banking & Insurance (S)
2018-01-19Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback