KY SB94 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - 3rd reading, passed 63-34 with floor amendments (2-title) and (4)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 158 to outline rationale for summer learning camps; define terms; encourage the establishment of summer learning camps for students who are identified for Title I services that meet certain minimum requirements and that include innovative instruction in the core academic areas and enrichment activities; create a new section of KRS Chapter 157 to describe how funding may be provided; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to summer learning camps and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-15 3rd reading, passed 63-34 with floor amendments (2-title) and (4)
2010-04-15 floor amendments (3) and (4) filed
2010-04-14 floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
2010-04-14 placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, April 14, 2010
2010-04-14 taken from committee
2010-03-29 recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2010-03-29 taken from the Regular Orders of the Day
2010-03-25 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 26, 2010
2010-03-24 2nd reading, to Rules
2010-03-23 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
2010-03-11 posted in committee
2010-02-18 reassigned to Education (H)
2010-02-17 to Economic Development (H)
2010-02-12 received in House
2010-02-11 3rd reading, passed 38-0
2010-02-09 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2010
2010-02-05 2nd reading, to Rules
2010-02-04 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2010-01-21 to Education (S)
2010-01-20 introduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback