KY SB92 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 085)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 085)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 311A.120 to require training on awareness of sexual violence for emergency medical technicians.
Title
AN ACT relating to sexual violence training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 976 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 293 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 836 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 293 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 836 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 085) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Bill passed 37-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) on Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | received in House |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2019-01-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |