KY SB90 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 230)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 230)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 533 to establish a behavioral health conditional dismissal pilot program beginning October 1, 2022, and continuing for four years to provide eligible individuals an alternative to receive treatment for a behavioral health disorder instead of incarceration, resulting in dismissal of the criminal charges upon successful completion of the program; identify the counties participating in the pilot program; define terms; establish program procedures, reporting requirements, and program requirements including access to medical treatment, counseling, education, and vocational counseling and training; create a council with designated membership to assist with the implementation of the pilot program; provide that the council shall end September 30, 2027; amend KRS 197.020 to provide for telehealth services in county jails; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to legal proceedings and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2383 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 568 (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 437 (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2157 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 568 (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 437 (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2157 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 230) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-04-14 | Senate | passed 35-1 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2022-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Free Conference Committee Report (1) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-04-14 | House | passed 91-3 |
2022-04-14 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2022-04-14 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report |
2022-04-14 | House | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | Conference Committee report (1) filed in House and Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | House refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendments (1) and (2) |
2022-03-30 | House | posted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) and (2) |
2022-03-30 | House | taken from Rules |
2022-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | received in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendments (1) and (2) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Floor Amendments (1) and (2) and Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-2 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendments (1) and (2) |
2022-03-25 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-24 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-22 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2022-03-18 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-18 | House | received in House |
2022-03-18 | Senate | passed 27-4 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn |
2022-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-10 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Appropriations
Attorney, Commonwealth's
Attorney, County
Corrections Impact
Counties
Court, Supreme
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Health and Medical Services
Jails and Jailers
Local Mandate
Mental Health
Opioids
Public Advocate
Reports Mandated
Sunset Legislation
Workforce
Appropriations
Attorney, Commonwealth's
Attorney, County
Corrections Impact
Counties
Court, Supreme
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Health and Medical Services
Jails and Jailers
Local Mandate
Mental Health
Opioids
Public Advocate
Reports Mandated
Sunset Legislation
Workforce