KY SB9 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 020)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 311 to require a person who intends to perform an abortion to determine whether the unborn human individual has a detectable fetal heartbeat; prohibit a person from performing an abortion before determining whether the unborn human individual has a detectable fetal heartbeat; prohibit a person from performing an abortion after the detection of a fetal heartbeat; provide exceptions for medical emergencies; require documentation of whether an abortion was performed to preserve the health of the pregnant woman; specify that nothing in the Act restricts access to contraceptives; allow a woman to file a civil action for the wrongful death of her unborn child; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to inspect the medical records of a facility that performs abortions to ensure compliance with reporting requirements; permit the Attorney General to apply to a state or federal court for a declaration that the Act's provisions are constitutional, or an order lifting an injunction if one exists, if federal abortion law changes; amend KRS 311.595 to allow the Kentucky Board of Medical Licensure to suspend or revoke the license of any physician for violations; amend KRS 311.990 to establish criminal penalties for violations; amend KRS 213.101 to expand the statistical reporting system for abortions; allow for severability; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to abortion and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 366 (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 803 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 020)
2019-03-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-14Housepassed 71-19
2019-03-14Housefloor amendment (4) defeated
2019-03-14House3rd reading
2019-03-13Housefloor amendment (4) filed
2019-03-06Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-02-28Housefloor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed
2019-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-27Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-21Houseposted in committee
2019-02-19Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2019-02-15Housereceived in House
2019-02-14Senate3rd reading, passed 31-6
2019-02-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 14, 2019
2019-02-14Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2019-01-09Senatereturned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-01-09Senate2nd reading
2019-01-09Senatetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-01-08Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-01-08Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2019-01-08Senate1st reading
2019-01-08Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback