KY SB9 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-01 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-01 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Establish KRS Chapter 216C; create within that chapter various new sections establishing a medical review panel system for use in civil litigation relating to long-term-care facilities, including sections setting out definitions, delineating covered health care facilities and providers, panel membership and formation, functions and deliberations of the panel, and utilization of panel results in civil actions.
Title
AN ACT relating to medical review panels involving long-term-care facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | posting withdrawn |
2013-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-20 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2013-02-14 | House | received in House |
2013-02-13 | Senate | passed 23-12 with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-13 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) (2) (3) (4) (5) and (6) withdrawn |
2013-02-13 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-13 | Senate | floor amendments (7) (8) (9) and (10) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-02-12 | Senate | recommitted to Health & Welfare (S) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | taken from Rules (S) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | floor amendment (6) filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) (2) (3) (4) and (5) filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |