KY SB83 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - floor amendment (3) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - floor amendment (3) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 344 to define terms; prohibit discrimination against medical care providers who decline to perform procedures that violate their conscience; grant providers the right not to participate in or pay for services that violate their conscience; exempt providers from liability for exercising these rights; establish a civil cause of action for persons injured by violations of these provisions.
Title
AN ACT protecting the exercise of medical ethics and diversity within the medical profession.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Insurance, Health
Medicaid
Nurses
Optometrists
Personnel and Employment
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Insurance, Health
Medicaid
Nurses
Optometrists
Personnel and Employment
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/21RS/sb83.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/21RS/sb83/orig_bill.pdf |