KY SB83 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 311.377 to add medical malpractice actions, actions arising out of review of credentials or of retrospective review and evaluation, and actions by an applicant for or grantee of staff privileges to materials that are confidential and privileged and not subject to discovery, subpoena, or introduction into evidence, in any civil action in any court.
Title
AN ACT relating to medical review organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-27 | House | received in House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 22-14 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 26, 2015 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB83.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB83/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB83/vote_history.pdf |