KY SB81 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 154)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 154)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.080 to require private and parochial schools to operate on a school calendar with a minimum school term and student instructional year as defined in KRS 158.070 instead of for a term not less than the public school district in which the child resides.
Title
AN ACT relating to private and parochial school calendars.
Sponsors
Sen. Amanda Mays Bledsoe [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] | Sen. Gary Boswell [R] | Sen. Donald Douglas [R] |
Sen. Jason Howell [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tichenor [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 350 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa2 RSN# 2522 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa2 RSN# 2522 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 154) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2023-03-14 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-03-10 | House | to Education (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | received in House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35 -1 with Floor Amendment (2) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2023-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 01, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed |
2023-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-23 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-02-09 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |