KY SB79 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 111)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 111)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 18A.245 and repeal and reenact KRS 18A.262 to establish conflict of interest provisions for trustees of the Kentucky Public Employees' Deferred Compensation Authority; amend KRS 18A.230 and 18A.255 to define financial planning, further provide guidance on advice provided to participants, and authorize the promulgation of administrative regulations; amend KRS 18A.250 to clarify auto enrollment provisions and authorize the promulgation of administrative regulations for implementation.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Public Employees Deferred Compensation Authority plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 333 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 1605 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 1605 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 111) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-11 | House | to State Government (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-11 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | received in House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-01-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |