KY SB78 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - floor amendment (6) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 314.011 to allow designated advanced practice registered nurses certified in psychiatric-mental health nursing to prescribe up to two sequential refills for a 30 day supply of psychostimulants; amend KRS 314.042 to remove the one-year practice requirement before an APRN may prescribe controlled substances under a CAPA-CS; establish conditions for an APRN to prescribe controlled substances without a CAPA-CS after four years of controlled substance prescribing authority under a CAPA-CS; require an APRN to confirm with the nursing board that the APRN's license is in good standing before prescribing without a CAPA-CS; set procedures for the nursing board's license review; prohibit any attempt to require or compel an APRN to maintain a CAPA-CS to prescribe after the four year threshold; exempt an equivalently qualified out-of-state APRN from the CAPA-CS requirement to prescribe under licensure by endorsement; require an APRN with less than four years of prescribing controlled substances to maintain a CAPA-CS until the four years are completed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the prescriptive authority of advanced practice registered nurses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02Senatefloor amendment (6) filed
2021-02-24Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-23Senatefloor amendments (1), (2), (3), (4) and (5) filed
2021-02-23Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-04Senateto Licensing & Occupations (S)
2021-01-06Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-06Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback