KY SB75 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-01 - to Transportation (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-01 - to Transportation (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.010 to define "off-highway vehicles" or "OHV"; consider an OHV to be a motor vehicle for registration purposes; amend KRS 186.050 to establish an annual registration fee for resident OHVs and a $30 fee for nonresident OHV registration; allow the clerk to retain $5 for nonresident OHV registration; create new sections of KRS Chapter 189 to allow for the operation of OHVs on a county roadways and state roadways identified by the Transportation Cabinet and the Kentucky Mountain Regional Recreational Authority; prohibit OHV operation on any fully controlled access highway; allow a local government to prohibit OHV use on county roadways under its jurisdiction; establish OHV operation requirements; require the Transportation Cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations; establish exemptions; allow a nonresident OHV permit to be valid for six months; require the Transportation Cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations; amend KRS 189.517 to comply; amend KRS 189.990 to establish that operating an OHV in violation of Sections 3 and 4 of this Act shall be a Class B misdemeanor.
Title
AN ACT relating to off-highway vehicles and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Phillip Wheeler [R] | Sen. Steve West [R] | Sen. Rick Girdler [R] | Sen. Albert Robinson [R] |
Sen. Brandon Smith [R] | Sen. Johnny Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa2 RSN# 1391 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2020-04-01 | House | 2nd reading |
2020-04-01 | House | taken from Committee on Committees |
2020-03-19 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2020-03-19 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-19 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2020-03-19 | House | received in House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | passed 31-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-17 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | reassigned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Corrections Impact
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Local Government
Local Mandate
Motor Vehicles
Transportation
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Local Government
Local Mandate
Motor Vehicles
Transportation