KY SB74 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 189A.105 to remove the restriction that a judge can only issue a search warrant for a blood or urine test when a defendant has been charged with driving under the influence and a person has been killed or suffered physical injury.
Title
AN ACT relating to driving under the influence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1169 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-31 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | received in House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-4 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 28, 2020 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |