KY SB72 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 508 to define "female genital mutilation" and create the Class B felony of female genital mutilation; create a new section of KRS Chapter 211 to require the Department for Public Health in the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to develop, produce, and disseminate educational materials related to female genital mutilation; amend KRS 15.334 to require law enforcement training on female genital mutilation; amend KRS 311.595 to require a conviction of female genital mutilation to result in mandatory revocation of a physician's license; create a new section of KRS Chapter 413 to permit civil action for female genital mutilation for ten years; amend KRS 620.020 to include female genital mutilation in the definition of "abused or neglected child"; amend KRS 620.030 to provide that if a person knows or has reasonable cause to believe that a child is a victim of female genital mutilation, then that person shall immediately make an oral or written report to the appropriate authorities; create a new section of KRS Chapter 620 to require a report on female genital mutilation reports to the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to female genital mutilation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-15Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-08Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback