KY SB72 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - posting waived
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 56 to prohibit the naming of any state building or property in honor of any living statewide current or former constitutional officer, member of the General Assembly, Justice or Judge of the Court of Justice, or state employee; create a new section of KRS Chapter 12 to place the same restrictions on the naming of state programs or initiatives; amend KRS 177.074 to place the same restrictions upon the naming of state highways and bridges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the naming of state properties, highways, bridges, and programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 2 RSN# 409 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 409 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27Houseposting waived
2018-03-16Housereturned to State Government (H)
2018-03-16House2nd reading
2018-03-16Housetaken from State Government (H)
2018-03-15Housereturned to State Government (H)
2018-03-15House1st reading
2018-03-15Housetaken from State Government (H)
2018-02-06Houseto State Government (H)
2018-02-02Housereceived in House
2018-02-01Senatepassed 35-3 with Committee Substitute (2)
2018-02-01SenateCommittee Substitute (1) withdrawn
2018-02-01Senate3rd reading
2018-01-31Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 1, 2018
2018-01-31Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2)
2018-01-30Senaterecommitted to State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-29Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-01-26Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 29, 2018
2018-01-25Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-24Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-09Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback