KY SB71 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 151)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 151)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require inclusion of abstinence education in any human sexuality or sexually transmitted diseases curriculum.
Title
AN ACT relating to health education.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Meredith [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Sen. Rick Girdler [R] |
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 699 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 424 (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 423 (Y: 26 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 393 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 424 (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 423 (Y: 26 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 393 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 151) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-02 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-02 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Bill passed 36-1 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute |
2018-03-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-27 | House | passed 77-14 with Committee Substitute |
2018-03-27 | House | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2018-03-27 | House | 3rd reading |
2018-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-20 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-03-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2018-03-16 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-29 | House | to Education (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | received in House |
2018-01-24 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | passed 32-5 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | floor amendment (2) defeated |
2018-01-24 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 24, 2018 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2018-01-18 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-01-11 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2018-01-10 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1st reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |