KY SB70 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-10 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 2)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-10 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 2)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize and appropriate $8,000,000 for the construction of a television broadcast/production studio at the University of Louisville; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT authorizing a University of Louisville capital project, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 56 (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 376 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 376 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-10 | Senate | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 2) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2018-01-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-01-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-01-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-01-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-01-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 86-4 |
2018-01-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 25, 2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-01-19 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-18 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | received in House |
2018-01-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 11, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-08 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | 1st reading |
2018-01-08 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |