KY SB7 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 45A to prohibit public employers in the Commonwealth from purchasing, acquiring, furnishing, or requiring an employee to purchase or acquire uniforms, wearing apparel, safety equipment, or protective accessories not manufactured in the United States of America, unless such items are not manufactured or available for purchase in the United States; permit public employers to purchase uniforms and safety equipment manufactured outside the United States if similar items are only available from one United States manufacturer and the price is substantially higher than comparable foreign-made items; require public employers who provide stipends to employees to purchase uniforms or safety equipment to encourage employees to purchase items made in the United States; require public employers that produce an annual report or audit to include information about the purchase of uniforms or safety equipment made in the United States in those documents; require the Department for Local Government to develop and publish guidelines for local governments regarding the purchase of uniforms and safety equipment made in the United States.
Title
AN ACT relating to retirement benefits for legislators.
Sponsors
Sen. Christian McDaniel [R] | Sen. Chris Girdler [R] | Sen. David Givens [R] | Sen. Morgan McGarvey [D] |
Sen. Dennis Parrett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | House | to State Government (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | received in House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Committee Substitute (1) withdrawn |
2013-02-27 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2013-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | recommitted to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-02-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2013-02-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2013-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2013 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-02-05 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2013-01-10 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |