KY SB64 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 88)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 88)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 510.010 to define "registrant" and "adult intermediary"; amend KRS 510.155 to include communications with adult intermediaries for minors and enhance punishment if the minor or perceived minor is under 12 years old, the offender is a registered sex offender, or a person travels into the Commonwealth for the purpose of procuring or promoting the use of a minor.
Title
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 336 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1572 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1572 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 88) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2021-03-15 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-15 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2021-03-12 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd reading |
2021-03-12 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-11 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-11 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | received in House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |