KY SB64 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 15.753 to provide that the Finance and Administration Cabinet shall reimburse the Attorney General, a Commonwealth's attorney, or a county attorney for fees or judgments after being sued for an act or omission in the course of his or her duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to indemnification of prosecutors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 1170 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-18Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-07Houseposted in committee
2020-01-31Houseto Judiciary (H)
2020-01-29Housereceived in House
2020-01-28Senate3rd reading, passed 35-0 with floor amendment (1)
2020-01-27Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-01-27Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 28, 2020
2020-01-17Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-16Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-08Senateto Judiciary (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback