KY SB61 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 049)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 312.018 to allow a student of chiropractic to engage in clinical practice under the supervision of a licensed chiropractor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to students of chiropractic.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 291 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 822 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 049)
2019-03-13Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-13Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-13Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-13Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-12House3rd reading, passed 100-0
2019-03-07Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-06Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2019-03-04Housereturned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-03-04House1st reading
2019-03-04Housetaken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-03-01Houseposted in committee
2019-02-22Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-02-21Housereceived in House
2019-02-20Senate3rd reading, passed 35-0
2019-02-19Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 20, 2019
2019-02-15Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-14Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-07Senatereassigned to Education (S)
2019-01-10Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback