KY SB61 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 049)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 049)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 312.018 to allow a student of chiropractic to engage in clinical practice under the supervision of a licensed chiropractor.
Title
AN ACT relating to students of chiropractic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 291 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 822 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 822 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 049) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2019-03-04 | House | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | House | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-22 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | received in House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-07 | Senate | reassigned to Education (S) |
2019-01-10 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |