KY SB61 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - returned to Transportation (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - returned to Transportation (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.456 to require that the expiration date of a disabled parking placard is indicated on the placard by a month and year hole-punch system; delete provision allowing for the issuance of a second parking placard; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2018.
Title
AN ACT relating to disabled parking placards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | returned to Transportation (H) |
2017-03-08 | House | 2nd reading |
2017-03-08 | House | taken from Transportation (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | returned to Transportation (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | 1st reading |
2017-03-07 | House | taken from Transportation (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2017-02-17 | House | received in House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | passed 35-0 with floor amendment (2) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2017-02-16 | Senate | committee amendment withdrawn |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee Substitute withdrawn |
2017-02-16 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2017-02-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 15, 2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-08 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1) |
2017-01-07 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |