KY SB60 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 55)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 214.155 to add spinal muscular atrophy to the list of heritable conditions tested at birth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to newborn screening for spinal muscular atrophy (SMA).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 314 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1182 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27Senatesigned by Governor (Acts ch. 55)
2020-03-19Senatedelivered to Governor
2020-03-19Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-19Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-19House3rd reading, passed 84-0
2020-03-18Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
2020-03-17Housereturned to Rules
2020-03-04Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 5, 2020
2020-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-27Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-25Houseposted in committee
2020-02-06Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-02-04Housereceived in House
2020-02-03Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0
2020-01-31Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 3, 2020
2020-01-30Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-29Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-08Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback