KY SB6 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 6.525 to provide that non-legislative compensation earned in another state-administered retirement system on or after July 1, 2020, shall not be used to calculate benefits in the Legislators' Retirement Plan; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Legislators' Retirement Plan and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2020-01-16Senate2nd reading
2020-01-16Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2020-01-15Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2020-01-15Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2020-01-15Senate1st reading
2020-01-15Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2020-01-13Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback